Heathcock v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sarah J Heathcock
Defendant: LoanCare, LLC and Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv03159
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 12/11/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 12/11/2020. Pltf Expert Report due by 1/22/2021. Deft Expert Report due by 2/26/2021. Discovery due by 4/23/2021. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 5/7/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/4/2021. Docket Call set for 6/11/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION. The Initial Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 2:00 PM is cancelled, filed. (aboyd, 4)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, LoanCare, LLC, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, LoanCare, LLC, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 268th Judicial District of Fort Bend County, Texas, case number 20-DCV-276268 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25186823) filed by LoanCare, LLC, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heathcock v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanCare, LLC
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah J Heathcock
Represented By: Arturo R Eureste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?