Genesis Energy, L.P. et al v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: MATAGORDA OFFSHORE, LLC, GENESIS CRUDE OIL, L.P., Genesis Energy, L.P. and GENESIS OFFSHORE HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: Toby Marek, Victor Fredericksen, Caleb Cook and John Hanks
Case Number: 4:2020cv03222
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Victor Fredericksen, John Hanks, Toby Marek, filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan)
November 6, 2020 Filing 19 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Caleb Cook, filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan)
October 29, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Toby Marek, filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan)
October 29, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by John Hanks, filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan)
October 27, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Genesis Crude Oil, L.P., Genesis Energy, L.P., Genesis Offshore Holdings, LLC, filed.(Warner, Justin)
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Victor Fredericksen, filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan)
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to John Hanks served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020, filed.(Warner, Justin)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Caleb Cook, filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan)
October 12, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Caleb Cook, filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Victor Fredericksen served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020, filed.(Warner, Justin)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Evan Martin Mcleod to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(JosephWells, 4)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Evans Martin McLeod to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Genesis Crude Oil, L.P., Genesis Energy, L.P., Genesis Offshore Holdings, LLC, Matagorda Offshore, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2020. (Warner, Justin)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Toby Marek, filed.(Warner, Justin)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Victor Fredericksen, filed.(Warner, Justin)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to John Hanks, filed.(Warner, Justin)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Caleb Cook, filed.(Warner, Justin)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/15/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Amended Civil Cover Sheet by GENESIS CRUDE OIL, L.P., GENESIS OFFSHORE HOLDINGS, LLC, Genesis Energy, L.P., MATAGORDA OFFSHORE, LLC, filed.(Warner, Justin)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25210389) filed by GENESIS OFFSHORE HOLDINGS, LLC, GENESIS CRUDE OIL, L.P., Genesis Energy, L.P., MATAGORDA OFFSHORE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Warner, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genesis Energy, L.P. et al v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATAGORDA OFFSHORE, LLC
Represented By: Justin Cole Warner
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENESIS CRUDE OIL, L.P.
Represented By: Justin Cole Warner
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genesis Energy, L.P.
Represented By: Justin Cole Warner
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENESIS OFFSHORE HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Justin Cole Warner
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toby Marek
Represented By: Susan D Noe Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Fredericksen
Represented By: Susan D Noe Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caleb Cook
Represented By: Thomas O Deen
Represented By: Candace A Ourso
Represented By: Susan D Noe Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hanks
Represented By: Susan D Noe Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?