Jones v. Collier et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Jones
Defendant: Dir of TDCJ-Parole Bryan Collier, Director of TDCJ CID Lorie Davis, Asst. Warden Kent and Sr. Warden Blake Lamb
Case Number: 4:2020cv03228
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Leslie Jones re: #7 Order of Dismissal, filed. (BrendaLacy, 4)
October 22, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Leslie Jones re: #7 Order of Dismissal, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This case is dismissed without prejudice for want of prosecution. Case terminated on 10/13/2020 (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Leslie Jones re: #3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening, filed. (ckrus, 4)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Leslie Jones re: #4 Notice of Deficient Pleading (FORM), filed. (ckrus, 4)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Leslie Jones. Parties notified Notice of Compliance due by 10/19/2020, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (bgoolsby, 4)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (agould, 3)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Leslie Jones, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2020. (agould, 3)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Leslie Jones.(agould, 3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Collier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dir of TDCJ-Parole Bryan Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of TDCJ CID Lorie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asst. Warden Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sr. Warden Blake Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?