Shih v. All Savers Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: M.D., P.A. Patrick Shih
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance and All Savers Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv03251
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Rule 16 Conference.(The Initial Conference is reset for 1/22/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore)(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Rule 16 Conference by All Savers Insurance Company, United Healthcare Insurance, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Munoz, Nicole)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Rule 16 Conference by United Healthcare Insurance, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jubinsky, Andrew)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Stipulation to Extend Defendants deadline to answer/respond to Plaintiffs complaint. (Answer due 11/21/2020 for United Healthcare Insurance). (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION re: Extending Deadline for Defendants to File Answer/Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by All Savers Insurance Company, United Healthcare Insurance, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Granting Agreed Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order Granting Agreed Stipulation)(Munoz, Nicole)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/8/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JacquelineMata, 4)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Roberts, Sean)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25226377) filed by Patrick Shih. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Complaint)(Roberts, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shih v. All Savers Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D., P.A. Patrick Shih
Represented By: Sean Alan Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Represented By: Nicole H. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Savers Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicole H. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?