Grogan v. Seaboard Marine, Ltd., Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Grogan
Defendant: Seaboard Marine, Ltd., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv03337
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1396
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Seaboard Marine, Ltd., Inc., filed.(James, David)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Seaboard Marine, Ltd., Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(DawnWaggoner, 4)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/22/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Seaboard Marine, Ltd., Inc., filed.(Cobos, Andrew)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Seaboard Marine, Ltd., Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0541-25269714) filed by Michael Grogan.(Cobos, Andrew) Payment information added on 9/30/2020 (ltien, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grogan v. Seaboard Marine, Ltd., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Grogan
Represented By: Andrew James Cobos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaboard Marine, Ltd., Inc.
Represented By: David Earl James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?