Royal Building Products (USA), Inc. et al v. Royal Texan Homes LLC
Plaintiff: Royal Group, Inc. and Royal Building Products (USA), Inc.
Defendant: Royal Texan Homes LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv03431
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Royal Texan Homes LLC, filed.(Bays, James)
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Royal Texan Homes LLC, filed.(Bays, James)
October 21, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Royal Building Products (USA), Inc., Royal Group, Inc. identifying Westlake Chemical Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Rawls, John)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Sarah Silbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Royal Texan Homes LLC served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020, filed.(Rawls, John)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ShadiaNashadi, 4)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/29/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Royal Texan Homes LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Sarah Silbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Royal Building Products (USA), Inc., Royal Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/26/2020. (Rawls, John)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Plaintiffs, filed.(Rawls, John)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE : Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark re: #1 Complaint by Royal Building Products (USA), Inc., Royal Group, Inc., filed. (Rawls, John)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Royal Texan Homes LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25301883) filed by Royal Building Products (USA), Inc., Royal Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rawls, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royal Building Products (USA), Inc. et al v. Royal Texan Homes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Texan Homes LLC
Represented By: James Randal Bays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royal Group, Inc.
Represented By: John Carlile Rawls, III
Represented By: Sarah A Silbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royal Building Products (USA), Inc.
Represented By: John Carlile Rawls, III
Represented By: Sarah A Silbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?