Baughman v. Wainwright et al Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, Austin Division.
Plaintiff: Steven Kurt Baughman
Defendant: Dale Wainwright, Rachell West, Christopher Johnson, Shannon Shannon, Jessica Gaston and Michael A Buchanan
Case Number: 4:2020cv03590
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 RECEIPT of Transfer Letter re: transfer of case to Western District of Texas. New Case # assigned: 1:20cv1058 and received on y., filed. (mmapps, 4)
October 20, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, Austin Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 10/20/2020, filed. (ghassan, 4)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, Austin Division. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dale Wainwright, Christopher Johnson, Shannon Shannon, Jessica Gaston, Rachell West, and Michael A. Buchanan, filed by Steven Kurt Baughman. (ghassan, 4)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Steven Kurt Baughman, filed. (ghassan, 4)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Steven Kurt Baughman, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/7/2020. (ghassan, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baughman v. Wainwright et al Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, Austin Division.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Wainwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachell West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Gaston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Kurt Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?