Benge v. Considine et al
Plaintiff: Cindy Lee Benge
Defendant: Trevor Considine and Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv03676
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Cindy Lee Benge, filed. (Wilson, Chad)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed.(Blum, Kimberly)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cindy Lee Benge, filed.(Wilson, Chad)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to order in removed cases, filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Trevor Considine. (Blum, Kimberly)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 12/11/2020(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 151st District Court, Harris County, case number 202061144 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25415773) filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Trevor Considine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Blum, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benge v. Considine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Considine
Represented By: Kimberly Ninh Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberly Ninh Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Lee Benge
Represented By: Chad Troy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?