Castillo v. Occidental Fire and Casualty Company of North Carolina
Plaintiff: Armando Castillo
Defendant: Occidental Fire and Casualty Company of North Carolina
Case Number: 4:2020cv03688
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Armando Castillo, filed.(Wilson, Chad)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 11/10/2020 (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Settlement by Occidental Fire and Casualty Company of North Carolina, filed. (Thompson, Rhonda)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/29/2021 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 240th Judicial District Court of Fort Bend County, Texas, case number 20-DCV-276990 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25419257) filed by Occidental Fire and Casualty Company of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Thompson, Rhonda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Occidental Fire and Casualty Company of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Fire and Casualty Company of North Carolina
Represented By: Rhonda J Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?