Sanders v. River Oaks Chrysler Jeep, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rochelle Sanders
Defendant: FCA US LLC and River Oaks Chrysler Jeep, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv03744
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Peter Bray
Referring Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Remand, filed by Rochelle Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Dunn, Joseph)
December 3, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to #8 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Foots Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A-1 - River Oaks Records, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Paul Shea, #4 Proposed Order)(Sonnier, G.)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/26/2021 at 11:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by FCA US LLC, filed.(Sonnier, G.)
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by River Oaks Chrysler Jeep, Inc., filed. (Armstrong, Travis)
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by River Oaks Chrysler Jeep, Inc., filed.(Armstrong, Travis)
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Rochelle Sanders, filed.(Dunn, Joseph)
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by FCA US LLC, filed. (Sonnier, G.)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 Opposed MOTION to RemandMotions referred to Peter Bray. by Rochelle Sanders, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Dunn, Joseph)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Lancaster on behalf of FCA US LLC, filed. (Sonnier, G.)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Cade Armstrong on behalf of River Oaks Chrysler Jeep, Inc., filed. (Armstrong, Travis)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 General Reference to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(hlermaadi, 4)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FCA US LLC, filed.(Sonnier, G.)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FCA US LLC, filed.(Sonnier, G.)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 269th District Court, Harris, case number 2020-52601 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25450127) filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Original Petition, #3 Exhibit B - Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit C - FCA US Answer to Amended Petition, #5 Exhibit D - River Oaks Answer, #6 Exhibit E - Return of Service FCA US, #7 Exhibit F - Return of Service River Oaks, #8 Exhibit G - State Court Docket Sheet, #9 Exhibit H - State Court Jury Demand, #10 Exhibit I - Notice to State Court, #11 Exhibit J - List of Counsel)(Sonnier, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. River Oaks Chrysler Jeep, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: G. Robert Sonnier
Represented By: Ian Matthew Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River Oaks Chrysler Jeep, Inc.
Represented By: Travis Cade Armstrong
Represented By: Steven ONeal Grubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Sanders
Represented By: Joseph M Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?