Baboolal v. Rise Facilities Management Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Baboolal
Defendant: Rise Association Management Group, LLC and Rise Facilities Management Group, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv03783
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Conference reset for 1/19/2021 at 09:45 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon (sjones, 4)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service)(JosephWells, 4)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jennifer Baboolal, filed.(Rosenberg, Gregg)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 03/16/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 02/12/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 09/14/2021. Deft Expert Report due by 10/14/2021. Discovery due by 11/30/2021. Mediation due by 02/18/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 01/04/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 01/04/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 03/22/2022. Docket Call set for 04/18/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jengonzalezadi)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/13/2021 at 09:45 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ShadiaNash, 4)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons RFMG)(Rosenberg, Gregg)
November 9, 2020 Summons Not Issued as to Rise Facilities Management Group, LLC due to these deficiencies: No Case Number. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4)
November 9, 2020 Summons Not Issued as to Rise Association Management Group, LLC due to these deficiencies: No Case Number. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Rise Facilities Management Group, LLC, filed.(Rosenberg, Gregg)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Rise Association Management Group, LLC, filed.(Rosenberg, Gregg)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25475262) filed by Jennifer Baboolal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenberg, Gregg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baboolal v. Rise Facilities Management Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rise Association Management Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rise Facilities Management Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Baboolal
Represented By: Gregg M Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?