Oil Mop LLC
Petitioner: Oil Mop LLC doing business as OMI Environmental Solutions
Claimant: Gary Jones
Case Number: 4:2020cv03939
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30511
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Publication (Chronicle), filed.(Stepp, Jad)
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Oil Mop LLC, filed.(Stepp, Jad)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Gary Jones, filed.(Rhine, Eric)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER ON COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 MONITION issued ( Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison), filed.(agould, 3)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Andrew Edison re #3 MOTION for Order Approving Security Directing Issuance of Notice and Restraining Prosecution of Claims, filed. (gclair, 4)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/10/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4)
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Order Approving Security Directing Issuance of Notice and Restraining Prosecution of Claims by Oil Mop LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Ad Interim Stipulation of Value LOU, #2 Notice to Claimants, #3 Monition, #4 Order Approving Security, Notice, Stay)(Stepp, Jad)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 Verification to Complaint by Oil Mop LLC, filed.(Stepp, Jad)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Parties (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25539435) filed by Oil Mop LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stepp, Jad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oil Mop LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oil Mop LLC doing business as OMI Environmental Solutions
Represented By: Jad J Stepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gary Jones
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Rhine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?