US Synthetic Corporation v. CR Gems
Plaintiff: US Synthetic Corporation
Defendant: CR Gems and CR Gems Superabrasives Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2020cv03962
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by US Synthetic Corporation, filed.(Jones, Miranda)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Kelly S. Horn to Appear Pro Hac Vice for US Synthetic Corporation. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Alexander E. Harding to Appear Pro Hac Vice for US Synthetic Corporation. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Mareesa A. Frederick to Appear Pro Hac Vice for US Synthetic Corporation. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Daniel C. Cooley to Appear Pro Hac Vice for US Synthetic Corporation. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion for James R. Barney to Appear Pro Hac Vice for US Synthetic Corporation. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
December 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin C. Villasenor on behalf of US Synthetic Corporation, filed. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Kelly S. Horn to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Alexander E. Harding to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Mareesa A. Frederick to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Daniel C. Cooley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for James R. Barney to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CR Gems. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ShadiaNashadi, 4)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/5/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to CR Gems, filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CR Gems (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25545169) filed by US Synthetic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Jones, Miranda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Synthetic Corporation v. CR Gems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Synthetic Corporation
Represented By: Miranda Yan Jones
Represented By: Daniel C. Cooley
Represented By: Alexander E. Harding
Represented By: Kelly S. Horn
Represented By: James R. Barney
Represented By: Erin C Villasenor
Represented By: Mareesa A. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Gems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Gems Superabrasives Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?