Nitetek Licensing LLC v. Endress+Hauser Inc.
Plaintiff: Nitetek Licensing LLC
Defendant: Endress+Hauser Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04024
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - granting #10 Motion for John M. Hintz to Appear Pro Hac Vice for EndressHauser Inc. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
January 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Hintz on behalf of EndressHauser Inc., filed. (mmapps, 4)
January 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for John M. Hintz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by EndressHauser Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/28/2021. (mmapps, 4)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for EndressHauser Inc. 1/29/2021.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Nitetek Licensing LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to EndressHauser Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4)
November 27, 2020 Filing 6 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (hcarradi, 4)
November 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 3/26/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to EndressHauser Inc., filed.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nitetek Licensing LLC, filed.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Nitetek Licensing LLC, filed. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EndressHauser Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25566801) filed by Nitetek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nitetek Licensing LLC v. Endress+Hauser Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endress+Hauser Inc.
Represented By: John M. Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nitetek Licensing LLC
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?