UV Partners, Inc. v. Proximity Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: UV Partners, Inc. and UV Angel
Defendant: Proximity Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04120
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Proximity Systems, Inc., filed.(Anderson, David)
January 29, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Proximity Systems, Inc., filed.(Anderson, David)
January 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie B. Cunningham on behalf of Proximity Systems, Inc., filed. (Cunningham, Julie)
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David K. Anderson on behalf of Proximity Systems, Inc., filed. (Anderson, David)
January 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Joint Stipulation as to Service and Time to Respond to Complaint by UV Partners, Inc., filed. (Jones, Miranda)
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Proximity Systems, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4)
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Proximity Systems, Inc., filed.(Jones, Miranda)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for R Michael Azzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for R. Michael Azzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by UV Partners, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/31/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UV Partners, Inc., filed.(Jones, Miranda)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JacquelineMataadi, 4)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/19/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin C. Villasenor on behalf of UV Partners, Inc., filed. (Villasenor, Erin)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Proximity Systems, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25607847) filed by UV Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Jones, Miranda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UV Partners, Inc. v. Proximity Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UV Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Erin C Villasenor
Represented By: Miranda Yan Jones
Represented By: R Michael Azzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UV Angel
Represented By: Erin C Villasenor
Represented By: Miranda Yan Jones
Represented By: R Michael Azzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proximity Systems, Inc.
Represented By: David Kent Anderson
Represented By: Julie B Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?