Gulf Winds International Inc v. Almanzar et al
Plaintiff: Gulf Winds International Inc
Defendant: Almanzar Enterprises, LLC, Almanzar Enterprises National, Inc., Ricardo R Almanzar, Jr., Hydro Precision Tubing Monterrey, LLC, Hydro Precision Tubing USA, LLC and Hydro Precision Tubing Monterrey Central, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv04136
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hydro Precision Tubing USA, LLC served on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/22/2021, filed.(Robbins, Michael)
January 4, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hydro Precision Tubing Monterrey, LLC served on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/22/2021, filed.(Robbins, Michael)
January 4, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hydro Precision Tubing Monterrey Central, LLC served on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/22/2021, filed.(Robbins, Michael)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 05/11/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 04/09/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 11/09/2021. Deft Expert Report due by 12/09/2021. Discovery due by 01/25/2022. Mediation due by 04/12/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 02/24/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 02/24/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 05/12/2022. Docket Call set for 06/20/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jengonzalezadi)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/10/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4)
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Ricardo R Almanzar, Jr, Hydro Precision Tubing Monterrey Central, LLC, Hydro Precision Tubing Monterrey, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon)(hlerma, 4)
December 11, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Almanzar Enterprises National, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
December 11, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Almanzar Enterprises, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hydro Precision Tubing USA, LLC, filed.(Robbins, Michael)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hydro Precision Tubing Monterrey, LLC, filed.(Robbins, Michael)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hydro Precision Tubing Monterrey Central, LLC, filed.(Robbins, Michael)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Ricardo R Almanzar, Jr, filed.(Robbins, Michael)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Almanzar Enterprises National, Inc., filed.(Robbins, Michael)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Almanzar Enterprises, LLC, filed.(Robbins, Michael)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25611819) filed by Gulf Winds International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robbins, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulf Winds International Inc v. Almanzar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Almanzar Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Almanzar Enterprises National, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo R Almanzar, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hydro Precision Tubing Monterrey, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hydro Precision Tubing USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hydro Precision Tubing Monterrey Central, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulf Winds International Inc
Represented By: Michael Dennis Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?