United States of America v. $126,329 Seized from Veritex Bank Account x2089 et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $400,000 Seized from TD Ameritrade Account x3756, $300,000 Seized from TD Ameritrade Account x0827 and $126,329 Seized from Veritex Bank Account x2089
Claimant: Medley Compounding Pharmacy, Shalini Shelley Aggarwal Heritage Trust, Ajay Aggarwal, Pearl Affordable Family Limited Partnership and Shobha Aggarwal
Case Number: 4:2020cv04196
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 0981 Forfeiture in Rem
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Dismiss civil forfeiture case.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
February 8, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 [Dkt. 7 Order of Stay], #2 Proposed Order)(Rollinson, Kristine)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #5 Agreed MOTION to Stay . This cause of action is STAYED and administratively (statistically) closed. The parties may move to reinstate the case on the court's active docket at such time in the future as deemed appropriate. A copy of this order shall be attached as an exhibit to any motion to reinstate. Case terminated on 2/3/2021.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of Service on 1/29/2021 re: Warrant of Arrest In Rem, filed.(jdav, 4)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 Agreed MOTION to Stay by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rollinson, Kristine)
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 CLAIM filed by The Shalini Shelley Aggarwal Heritage Trust, Shobha Aggarwal, Ajay Aggarwal, Medley Compounding Pharmacy, LLC, Pearl Affordable Family Limited Partnership.(Kaper, Ashley)
January 7, 2021 WARRANT of Arrest in REM issued ( Signed by Judge Judge Gray H Miller), filed.(thanniable, 4)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Rollinson, Kristine)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest in Rem by United States of America, filed.(Rollinson, Kristine)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $126,329 Seized from Veritex Bank Account x2089, $300,000 Seized from TD Ameritrade Account x0827, $400,000 Seized from TD Ameritrade Account x3756 filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Rollinson, Kristine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $126,329 Seized from Veritex Bank Account x2089 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $400,000 Seized from TD Ameritrade Account x3756
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $300,000 Seized from TD Ameritrade Account x0827
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $126,329 Seized from Veritex Bank Account x2089
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kristine E Rollinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Medley Compounding Pharmacy
Represented By: Ashley Louise Kaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shalini Shelley Aggarwal Heritage Trust
Represented By: Ashley Louise Kaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ajay Aggarwal
Represented By: Ashley Louise Kaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Pearl Affordable Family Limited Partnership
Represented By: Ashley Louise Kaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shobha Aggarwal
Represented By: Ashley Louise Kaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?