CHG Hospital Medical Center LLC et al v. United HealthCare Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: CHG Hospital Medical Center LLC doing business as Cornerstone Hospital Medical Center, Solara Hospital Harlingen, LP doing business as Solara Hospital Harlingen and CHG Hospital Tucson, LLC doing business as Cornerstone Specialty Hospitals Tucson
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc. and UMR, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04229
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #4 MOTION to Remand. Responses due by 2/15/2021..(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by UMR, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order - Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Munoz, Nicole)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by UMR, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., filed.(Munoz, Nicole)
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 2/25/2021 at 02:45 PM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. A Zoom link will be email for participation. (leddins, 4)
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UMR, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., filed.(Munoz, Nicole)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by CHG Hospital Medical Center LLC, CHG Hospital Tucson, LLC, Solara Hospital Harlingen, LP, filed.(Graves, Melissa)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by CHG Hospital Medical Center LLC, CHG Hospital Tucson, LLC, Solara Hospital Harlingen, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit A-1 - DE Secretary of State Information, #3 Proposed Order)(Graves, Melissa)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by UMR, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 10:30 AM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. A Zoom link will be emailed for participation. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Judge's Procedures) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 333rd District Court, Harris County, TX, case number 2020-71725 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25654902) filed by United HealthCare Services, Inc., UMR, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - TX SOS inquiry re CHG Hospital Medical Center, LLC, #2 Exhibit B - TX SOS inquiry re CHG Hospital Tuscon LLC, #3 Exhibit C - UHS Declaration iso Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D - UMR Declaration iso Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E - Service of Process Transmittal, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Docs, #7 Exhibit G - List of Parties & Counsel, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Munoz, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHG Hospital Medical Center LLC et al v. United HealthCare Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole H. Munoz
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMR, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole H. Munoz
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHG Hospital Medical Center LLC doing business as Cornerstone Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Leigh Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solara Hospital Harlingen, LP doing business as Solara Hospital Harlingen
Represented By: Leigh Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHG Hospital Tucson, LLC doing business as Cornerstone Specialty Hospitals Tucson
Represented By: Leigh Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?