Centex Homes et al v. Evanston Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Centex Homes dba Centex Real Estate Corporation, Pulte Homes of Texas, L.P. and Centex Homes doing business as Centex Real Estate Corporation
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company, Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company, AIG Specialty Insurance Company, Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company, Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company, American Empire Surplus Lines Ins. Co., Republic Underwriters Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Gotham Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company, First Mercury Insurance Company, Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Clarendon National Insurance Company, Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company and Companion Property & Casualty Co.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04291
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 49 ANSWER to #31 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Republic Underwriters Insurance Company, filed.(Bradley, Beth)
February 10, 2021 Filing 48 ANSWER to #31 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company, filed.(Pickering, P.)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their answer or other response to Plaintiff's amended complaint on or before 02/23/2021.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
February 5, 2021 Filing 46 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021, filed.(Thomas, Scott)
February 5, 2021 Filing 45 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021, filed.(Thomas, Scott)
February 5, 2021 Filing 44 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021, filed.(Thomas, Scott)
February 5, 2021 Filing 43 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Gotham Insurance Company served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021, filed.(Thomas, Scott)
February 5, 2021 Filing 42 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to First Mercury Insurance Company served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021, filed.(Thomas, Scott)
February 5, 2021 Filing 41 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Evanston Insurance Company served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021, filed.(Thomas, Scott)
February 5, 2021 Filing 40 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to AIG Specialty Insurance Company served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021, filed.(Thomas, Scott)
February 5, 2021 Filing 39 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer Date by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cook, Kevin)
February 2, 2021 Filing 38 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Clarendon National Insurance Company served on 1/28/2021, answer due 2/18/2021, filed.(Thomas, Scott)
February 1, 2021 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Republic Underwriters Insurance Company, filed.(Bradley, Beth)
January 27, 2021 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company, filed.(Pickering, P.)
January 27, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by P. Wayne Pickering on behalf of Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company, filed. (Pickering, P.)
January 27, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Martin on behalf of Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company, filed. (Pickering, P.)
January 26, 2021 Filing 33 Summons Issued as to AIG Specialty Insurance Company, American Empire Surplus Lines Ins. Co., Clarendon National Insurance Company, Evanston Insurance Company, First Mercury Insurance Company, Gotham Insurance Company, Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company, Republic Underwriters Insurance Company, Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company, Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company, Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 AmEmpire, #2 Clarendon, #3 Evanston, #4 FirstMercury, #5 Gotham, #6 Hallmark, #7 Liberty, #8 Ohio, #9 Republic, #10 Republic-Vanguard, #11 Starr, #12 Tokio, #13 Travelers)(rguerrero, 4)
January 25, 2021 Filing 32 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons (Am. Empire), #2 Summons (Clarendon), #3 Summons (Evanston), #4 Summons (First Mercury), #5 Summons (Gotham), #6 Summons (Hallmark), #7 Summons (Liberty), #8 Summons (Ohio), #9 Summons (Republic Underwriters), #10 Summons (Repbulic-Vanguard), #11 Summons (Starr), #12 Summons (Tokio), #13 Summons (Travelers))(Thomas, Scott)
January 25, 2021 Filing 31 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Pulte Homes of Texas, L.P., Centex Homes.(Thomas, Scott)
January 22, 2021 Filing 30 Letter from Texas Department of Insurance advising the complaint in this case does not indicate the Commissioner of Insurance as the agent for service for Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company, filed. (jdav, 4)
January 22, 2021 Filing 29 Letter from Texas Department of Insurance advising the complaint in this case does not indicate the Commissioner Of Insurance as agent for service for Tokio Marine Sepcialty Insurance Company, filed. (jdav, 4)
January 22, 2021 Filing 28 Letter from Texas Department of Insurance advising the complaint in this case does not indicate the Commissioner of Insurance as agent for service for Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company, filed. (jdav, 4)
January 22, 2021 Filing 27 Letter from Texas Department of Insurance advising the complaint in this case does not indicate the Commissioner of Insurance as the agent for serivce for First Mercury Insurance Company, filed. (jdav, 4)
January 22, 2021 Filing 26 Letter from Texas Department of Insurance advising the complaint in this case does not indicate the Commissioner of Insurance as the agent for serivce for Evanston Insurance Company., filed. (jdav, 4)
January 22, 2021 Filing 25 Letter from Texas Department of Insurance advising the complaint in this case does not indicate the Commissioner of Insurance as the agent for service for Gotham Insurance Company, filed. (jdav, 4)
January 22, 2021 Filing 24 Letter from Texas Department of Insurance advising the complaint in this case does not indiciate the Commissioner of Insurance as the agent for service for AIG Specialty Insurance Company., filed. (jdav, 4)
January 12, 2021 Filing 23 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021, filed.(Thomas, Scott)
January 12, 2021 Filing 22 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021, filed.(Thomas, Scott)
January 12, 2021 Filing 21 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021, filed.(Thomas, Scott)
January 12, 2021 Filing 20 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Gotham Insurance Company served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021, filed.(Thomas, Scott)
January 12, 2021 Filing 19 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to First Mercury Insurance Company served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021, filed.(Thomas, Scott)
January 12, 2021 Filing 18 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Evanston Insurance Company served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021, filed.(Thomas, Scott)
January 12, 2021 Filing 17 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to AIG Specialty Insurance Company served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021, filed.(Thomas, Scott)
January 12, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Centex Homes, Pulte Homes of Texas, L.P., PulteGroup, Inc., filed.(Thomas, Scott)
January 11, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Clarendon National Insurance Company served on 1/7/2021, answer due 1/28/2021, filed.(Thomas, Scott)
January 8, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021, filed.(Patton, Amy)
January 8, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Republic Underwriters Insurance Company served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021, filed.(Patton, Amy)
January 8, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Ohio Security Insurance Company served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021, filed.(Patton, Amy)
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021, filed.(Patton, Amy)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 05/13/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 04/13/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 11/09/2021. Deft Expert Report due by 12/09/2021. Discovery due by 01/25/2022. Mediation due by 04/12/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 02/24/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 02/24/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 05/12/2022. Docket Call set for 06/20/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jengonzalezadi) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Sarah J. Odia to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Scott S. Thomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to AIG Specialty Insurance Company, American Empire Surplus Lines Ins. Co., Clarendon National Insurance Company, Evanston Insurance Company, First Mercury Insurance Company, Gotham Insurance Company, Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company, Republic Underwriters Insurance Company, Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company, Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company, Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons (Am. Empire), #2 Summons (Clarendon), #3 Summons (Evanston), #4 Summons (First Mercury), #5 Summons (Gotham), #6 Summons (Hallmark), #7 Summons (Liberty), #8 Summons (Ohio), #9 Summons (Republic Underwriters), #10 Summons (Repbulic-Vanguard), #11 Summons (Starr), #12 Summons (Tokio), #13 Summons (Travelers))(Patton, Amy)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Sarah J. Odia to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Pulte Homes of Texas, L.P., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/7/2021. (MarcelleLaBee, 4)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Scott S. Thomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Pulte Homes of Texas, L.P., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/7/2021. (MarcelleLaBee, 4)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Centex Homes dba Centex Real Estate Corporation, Pulte Homes of Texas, L.P., filed.(Patton, Amy)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25685745) filed by Pulte Homes of Texas, L.P., Centex Homes dba Centex Real Estate Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Patton, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centex Homes et al v. Evanston Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company
Represented By: P. Wayne Pickering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Empire Surplus Lines Ins. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: Beth D Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin J Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gotham Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin J Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Mercury Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarendon National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Companion Property & Casualty Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centex Homes dba Centex Real Estate Corporation
Represented By: Amy R Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pulte Homes of Texas, L.P.
Represented By: Amy R Patton
Represented By: Scott S. Thomas
Represented By: Sarah J. Odia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centex Homes doing business as Centex Real Estate Corporation
Represented By: Amy R Patton
Represented By: Scott S. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?