Jurassic Quest Holdings, LLC v. Pinnacle Production Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Jurassic Quest Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Pinnacle Production Group, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv04310
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 23 RETURN of Service, filed.(Kimbell, James)
January 19, 2021 Filing 22 Letter to the Honorable George C. Hanks, Jr. by Pinnacle Production Group, LLC, filed.(Erwin, Brandt)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Striking Document re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss . The motion does not comply with the Courts Procedures section 6(B) regarding pre-motion conferences required for particular motions. The motion does not comply with the Courts Procedures section 6(C)(2), which requires a certificate of conference for all motions.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
January 13, 2021 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Pinnacle Production Group, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4)
January 12, 2021 Filing 19 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Jurassic Quest Holdings, LLC, filed.(Kimbell, James)
January 11, 2021 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pinnacle Production Group, LLC, filed.(Erwin, Brandt)
January 11, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Pinnacle Production Group, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Erwin, Brandt)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Temporary Injunctive Relief. The Motion Hearing reset for 12/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in by video is cancelled.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Thomas P. Harlan to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Brandt F. Erwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
December 22, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Temporary Injunctive Relief by Jurassic Quest Holdings, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Order)(Kimbell, James)
December 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily A. Donaher on behalf of Pinnacle Production Group, LLC, filed. (Donaher, Emily)
December 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Tim L. Droel on behalf of Pinnacle Production Group, LLC, filed. (Donaher, Emily)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Thomas P. Harlan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Pinnacle Production Group, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Donaher, Emily)
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Brandt F. Erwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Pinnacle Production Group, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Donaher, Emily)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, filed by Pinnacle Production Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Affidavit Declaration)(Donaher, Emily)
December 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William D. Cramer on behalf of Jurassic Quest Holdings, LLC, filed. (Cramer, William)
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ernesto Alvarez, Jr. on behalf of Jurassic Quest Holdings, LLC, filed. (Alvarez, Ernesto)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER For Expedited Response. Response is due by 12/22/20 at 3:00 p.m. Motion Hearing reset for 12/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in by video before Judge George C Hanks Jr. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Setting re: #1 Complaint,. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2020 at 12:30 PM in by video before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. Plaintiff will notify the defendant of this setting. (gclairadi, 4)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ChristopherSarratadi, 4)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pinnacle Production Group, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25695178) filed by Jurassic Quest Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trademark, #2 Exhibit Declaration, #3 Exhibit Google Search, #4 Exhibit Event Times, #5 Exhibit Google Search, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kimbell, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jurassic Quest Holdings, LLC v. Pinnacle Production Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jurassic Quest Holdings, LLC
Represented By: James M Kimbell
Represented By: Ernesto Alvarez, Jr
Represented By: William Dennis Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Production Group, LLC
Represented By: Brandt F. Erwin
Represented By: Emily Ann Donaher
Represented By: Thomas P. Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?