The Huntington National Bank v. Bristow U.S. LLC et al Do not docket in 4:20mc2447. File only in Adversary Case No. 20-03396.
Plaintiff: The Huntington National Bank
Defendant: Bristow U.S. LLC and Bristow Group Inc
Case Number: 4:2020mc02447
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 79 Case electronically transferred in from New York Southern; Case Number 1:17-cv-08595. This case will proceed under SDTX Adversary Case No. 20-3396. This mc case has been opened for reference purposes only. (ltien, 4)
July 31, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Southern District of Texas Bankruptcy Court.(ama)
July 24, 2020 Filing 78 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from George T. Shipley dated 7/17/2020 re: Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference prior to an anticipated motion to transfer this action to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Texas. ENDORSEMENT: Without objection, see Doc. 77, the Court transfers this case to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Texas in the interests of justice and for the convenience of the parties. See 28 U.S.C. 1412. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/24/2020) (ama) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
July 22, 2020 Filing 77 RESPONSE re: #75 Pre-Conference Statement . Document filed by The Huntington National Bank..(Dunn, Joshua)
July 20, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (mro)
July 20, 2020 Filing 76 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #75 Pre-Conference Statement filed by Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a pre-motion teleconference in this matter on August 6, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. The parties are directed to dial (877) 411-9748 and enter access code 3029857#. The plaintiff is further directed to respond to this letter by Wednesday, July 22, 2020. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/20/2020) (mro)
July 19, 2020 Filing 75 FIRST PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT / Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC..(Del Virginia, Gabriel)
April 23, 2020 Filing 74 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #73 STATUS REPORT. [Joint] Document filed by The Huntington National Bank. ENDORSEMENT: The deadline to submit pretrial statements is extended to Aug. 3, 2020. The parties are directed to appear for a status conference on July 29, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. Should the parties reach a settlement, they are directed to promptly inform the Court. (Status Conference set for 7/29/2020 at 03:30 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/23/2020) (rjm)
April 20, 2020 Filing 73 STATUS REPORT. [Joint] Document filed by The Huntington National Bank..(Dunn, Joshua)
January 14, 2020 Filing 72 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #71 JOINT STATUS REPORT. Document filed by The Huntington National Bank. ENDORSEMENT: The deadline to submit pretrial statements, Doc. 68, is extended to May 1, 2020. The parties are directed to appear for a status conference on April 29, 2020 at 10:30am. Should the parties reach a settlement, they are directed to promptly inform the Court. (Status Conference set for 4/29/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/14/2020) (rjm)
January 13, 2020 Filing 71 STATUS REPORT. (Joint) Document filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 9019 Motion, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order)(Dunn, Joshua)
January 6, 2020 Filing 70 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Richard Wilson dated 12/26/2019 re: For your review, I am enclosing correspondence received in the Office of the Clerk of Court on December 26, 2019 regarding the above-referenced action. ENDORSEMENT: In light of the attached decree from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Texas, the parties are directed to file a joint status report with the Court by January 13, 2020 discussing whether the automatic stay entered in this case, Doc. 69, may be lifted and if this case may proceed. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/6/2020) (kv)
May 17, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of /SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AND NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY STAY.. Document filed by Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC. (Del Virginia, Gabriel)
April 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Status Conference held on 4/11/2019. Plaintiff's counsel present. Defendants' counsel present. (jar)
April 4, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Rescheduling Notice - The status conference previously scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on April 11, 2019, is hereby rescheduled for 11:00 am on April 11. (jar)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' joint application for a 60-day extension of the deadline to file a joint pretrial statement is GRANTED. The parties shall file a pretrial statement with the Court by June 1, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/27/2019) (kv)
March 27, 2019 Filing 67 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Pretrial Statement addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Joshua Dunn dated March 27, 2019. Document filed by The Huntington National Bank.(Dunn, Joshua)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The March 15 status conference is adjourned to April 11, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. (Status Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
March 12, 2019 Filing 65 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq dated March 12, 2019. Document filed by Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC.(Del Virginia, Gabriel)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 OPINION & ORDER re: #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by The Huntington National Bank. For the reasons explained above, HNB's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Specifically, HNB's motion is GRANTED insofar as it seeks dismissal of Defendants' counterclaim for unjust enrichment, and it is DENIED otherwise. The parties are directed to appear for a status conference on Friday, March 15, 2019, at 10:00 A.M., and to file a joint pretrial statement in accordance with section 3.A of the Court's Individual Practices. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 28. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 3/15/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/1/2019) (kv)
November 9, 2018 Filing 63 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Joshua Dunn dated November 9, 2018 re: #61 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #29 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #34 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1, #30 Rule 56.1 Statement, #31 Declaration in Support of Motion, #35 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, #28 MOTION f or Summary Judgment. Document filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Dunn, Joshua)
November 5, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/9/2018 (jwh)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Letter Motion for Conference: A pre-motion conference will be held on November16, 2018, at 10:30 AM. Plaintiff is hereby directed to submit a written response, not to exceed three pages, by Friday, November 9, 2018. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/16/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/5/2018) (jwh)
November 3, 2018 Filing 61 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #29 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #34 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1, #30 Rule 56.1 Statement, #31 Declaration in Support of Motion, #35 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment . addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from George T. Shipley, Esq. dated November 2, 2018. Document filed by Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC.(Del Virginia, Gabriel)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #59 Letter filed by Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC. ENDORSEMENT: It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/2/2018) (jwh)
November 2, 2018 Filing 59 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Gabriel Del Virginia dated November 1, 2018 re: Adjournment of Conference scheduled for November 8, 2018 @ 3:30 pm. Document filed by Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC.(Del Virginia, Gabriel)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Jonathan B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #55 Motion for George T. Shipley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
October 16, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #56 MOTION for Jonathan B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15749758. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #55 MOTION for George T. Shipley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15749654. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 15, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION for Jonathan B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15749758. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bristow U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Motion Pro Hac Vice)(Smith, Jonathan)
October 15, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION for George T. Shipley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15749654. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bristow U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Shipley, George)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEYS: The undersigned hereby stipulate and consent to the substitution of the law firm of Law Offices of Gabriel Del Virginia, by and through its attorney, Gabriel Del Virginia, as attorneys of record for defendants Bristow U.S. LLC and Bristow Group Inc. (collectively, "Defendants") in the above-captioned action in place and instead of the law firm of Holland & Knight LLP, and its attorneys Marc L. Antonecchia and Duvol M. Thompson. Attorney Gabriel Del Virginia for Bristow Group Inc.,Gabriel Del Virginia for Bristow Group Inc.,Gabriel Del Virginia for Bristow U.S. LLC,Gabriel Del Virginia for Bristow U.S. LLC added. Attorney Marc L Antonecchia and Duvol Maurice Thompson terminated. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 10/9/2018) (mro)
October 8, 2018 Filing 53 PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC. (Antonecchia, Marc)
September 17, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 03:30 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (jwh)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER granting #51 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is not to be tried to a jury. Non-Expert Depositions due by 8/24/2018. Expert Deposition due by 11/7/2018. Discovery due by 11/7/2018. The next case management conference is scheduled for November 8, 2018, at 3:30 pm. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/17/2018) (jwh) Modified on 9/18/2018 (jwh).
September 14, 2018 Filing 51 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of Certain Expert Discovery Deadlines addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Joshua Dunn dated September 14, 2018. Document filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Revised Scheduling Order)(Dunn, Joshua)
July 26, 2018 Filing 50 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #49 Letter filed by Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. Attorney Sean Patrick Barry terminated. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/26/2018) (jwh)
July 25, 2018 Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Marc L. Antonecchia dated July 25, 2018 re: requests for an order allowing the withdrawal Sean P. Barry. Document filed by Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC.(Antonecchia, Marc)
July 25, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Duvol Maurice Thompson on behalf of Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC. (Thompson, Duvol)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER granting #46 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is not to be tried to a jury. Non-expert depositions shall be completed by August 24, 2018. Expert depositions shall be completed by October 8, 2018. ALL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY October 8, 2018. The Magistrate Judge assigned to this case is the Hon. Fox. The next case management conference is scheduled for October 12, 2018. (Deposition due by 10/8/2018. Discovery due by 10/8/2018.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/24/2018) (mro)
July 23, 2018 Filing 46 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Joshua Dunn dated July 23, 2018. Document filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Revised Scheduling Order)(Dunn, Joshua)
June 7, 2018 Filing 45 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
June 7, 2018 Filing 44 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING THE PRODUCTION AND USE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/4/2018) (jwh)
June 1, 2018 Filing 42 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
May 23, 2018 Filing 41 RESPONSE re: #34 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1 . Document filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Dunn, Joshua)
May 23, 2018 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (REDACTED). Document filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Dunn, Joshua)
May 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Non-expert depositions due by 7/24/2018. Expert depositions due by 10/8/2018. Discovery due by 10/8/2018. The next case management conference is scheduled for 10/12/2018. (ne)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER granting #38 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is not to be tried to a jury. Non-expert depositions due by 7/24/2018. Expert depositions due by 10/8/2018. Discovery due by 10/8/2018. The next case management conference is scheduled for 10/12/2018. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/21/2018) (ne)
May 18, 2018 Filing 38 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Joshua Dunn dated May 18, 2018. Document filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dunn, Joshua)
May 11, 2018 Filing 37 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
May 10, 2018 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #36 Order to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (rjm)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SEALING ORDER. Defendants' request, via letter dated May 9, 2018 and submitted under seal, to file under seal Exhibit M to the Declaration of Joseph A. Baj and discrete portions of their memorandum of law that reference both Exhibit M and a document subject to the Court's April 13, 2018 Sealing Order, is granted. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/10/2018) (rjm)
May 9, 2018 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (REDACTED). Document filed by Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC. (Antonecchia, Marc)
May 9, 2018 Filing 34 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #30 Rule 56.1 Statement,. Document filed by Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC. (Antonecchia, Marc)
May 9, 2018 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Joseph A. Baj in Opposition re: #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - K, #2 Exhibit L - Z)(Antonecchia, Marc)
April 13, 2018 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #32 Sealing Order to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (ras)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SEALING ORDER: Plaintiff's request, via letter dated April 11, 2018 and submitted under seal, to file Exhibit D to the Declaration of John Kennison, Doc. 31, under seal, is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/13/2018) (ras)
April 12, 2018 Filing 31 DECLARATION of John Kennison (Amended) in Support re: #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D - Application to File Under Seal Pending)(Dunn, Joshua)
April 11, 2018 Filing 30 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Kennison, #2 Exhibit A - to the Declaration of John Kennison, #3 Exhibit B - to the Declaration of John Kennison, #4 Exhibit C - to the Declaration of John Kennison)(Dunn, Joshua)
April 11, 2018 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Dunn, Joshua)
April 11, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by The Huntington National Bank.(Dunn, Joshua)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #26 Letter requests that the Court enter an Order allowing the withdrawal of Ms. Pauline T. Ha's appearance in this matter, filed by Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted., (Attorney Pauline Terry Ha terminated.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/3/18) (yv)
April 2, 2018 Filing 26 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Marc L. Antonecchia dated April 2, 2018 re: requests that the Court enter an Order allowing the withdrawal of Ms. Pauline T. Ha's appearance in this matter. Document filed by Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC.(Antonecchia, Marc)
April 2, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Patrick Barry on behalf of Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC. (Barry, Sean)
March 30, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 3/14/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 30, 2018 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 3/14/2018 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 14, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Pre-Motion Conference held on 3/14/2018. Plaintiff's counsel present. Defendant's counsel present. Plaintiff granted leave to file a motion for summary judgment with the following briefing schedule: moving papers due April 11, 2018; opposition due May 9, 2018; reply due May 23,2018. ( Motions due by 4/11/2018., Replies due by 5/23/2018., Responses due by 5/9/2018). (Court Reporter Alena Lynch) (jar)
March 9, 2018 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Marc L. Antonecchia dated March 9, 2018 re: response to plaintiff's letter (Dkt. 20) and pursuant to the Court's order (Dkt. 21).. Document filed by Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC.(Antonecchia, Marc)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion for Conference. A pre-motion conference is scheduled for March 14, 2018 at 10:30 am. Defendant is directed to submit a written response by Friday, March 9, 2018. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 3/14/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
March 2, 2018 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Joshua Dunn dated March 2, 2018. Document filed by The Huntington National Bank.(Dunn, Joshua)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is not to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 2/21/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 2/21/2018. Non-expert Deposition due by 5/25/2018. Expert Deposition due by 8/9/2018. Discovery due by 8/9/2018. Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/9/2018) (jwh)
February 9, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/9/2018. Plaintiff's counsel present. Defendant's counsel present. Case management plan signed. A case management conference is scheduled for August 9, 2018 at 11:00 am. (Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Court Reporter Steve Griffing) (jar)
January 19, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to #16 Counterclaim. Document filed by The Huntington National Bank.(Dunn, Joshua)
January 10, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, on February 9, 2018 at 10:30 am, at the United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, Courtroom 619, New York, New York 10007, and as further set forth in this Notice of Initial Court Conference. Jazmin Rivera, Deputy Clerk to Hon. Edgardo Ramos, U.S.D.J. (Initial Conference set for 2/9/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 619, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Edgardo Ramos). (rjm).
December 29, 2017 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,., COUNTERCLAIM against The Huntington National Bank. Document filed by Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC.(Antonecchia, Marc)
December 29, 2017 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bristow Group Inc..(Antonecchia, Marc)
December 29, 2017 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bristow Group Inc. for Bristow U.S. LLC. Document filed by Bristow U.S. LLC.(Antonecchia, Marc)
December 29, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pauline Terry Ha on behalf of Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC. (Ha, Pauline)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED between and among the undersigned counsel for the parties that the time for defendants Bristow U.S. LLC and Bristow Group Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint is hereby extended to and including December 29, 2017. (Bristow Group Inc. answer due 12/29/2017; Bristow U.S. LLC answer due 12/29/2017.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/22/2017) (jwh)
November 20, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc L Antonecchia on behalf of Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC. (Antonecchia, Marc)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for James V. Garvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
November 15, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for James V. Garvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14363210. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 14, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION for James V. Garvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14363210. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James V. Garvey in Support of His Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Garvey, James)
November 7, 2017 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dunn, Joshua)
November 7, 2017 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bristow Group Inc. (vf)
November 7, 2017 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bristow U.S. LLC. (vf)
November 7, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 7, 2017 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (vf)
November 7, 2017 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (vf)
November 7, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joshua Alan Dunn to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil Cover Sheet not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
November 6, 2017 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bristow Group Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Dunn, Joshua)
November 6, 2017 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bristow U.S. LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Dunn, Joshua)
November 6, 2017 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Bancshares Incorporated, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for The Huntington National Bank. Document filed by The Huntington National Bank.(Dunn, Joshua)
November 6, 2017 Filing 2 FILING ERROR -SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dunn, Joshua) Modified on 11/7/2017 (vf).
November 6, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bristow Group Inc., Bristow U.S. LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14333425)Document filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 1- Lease, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 2- Lease, #3 Exhibit 2-Guaranty, #4 Exhibit 3-Holdover Rent Invoice, #5 Exhibit 4-"Buy-in" Estimate)(Dunn, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Huntington National Bank v. Bristow U.S. LLC et al Do not docket in 4:20mc2447. File only in Adversary Case No. 20-03396.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Huntington National Bank
Represented By: James V Garvey
Represented By: Joshua Alan Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristow U.S. LLC
Represented By: George T Shipley
Represented By: Sean Patrick Barry
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce Smith
Represented By: Pauline Terry Ha
Represented By: Gabriel Del Virginia
Represented By: Marc L Antonecchia
Represented By: Duvol Maurice Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristow Group Inc
Represented By: Sean Patrick Barry
Represented By: Pauline Terry Ha
Represented By: Gabriel Del Virginia
Represented By: Marc L Antonecchia
Represented By: Duvol Maurice Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?