Ornare Houston, LLC v. National Drayage Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ornare Houston, LLC
Defendant: DGX-Dependable Global Express and National Drayage Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00084
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by National Drayage Services, LLC, filed.(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 18, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Drayage Services, LLC identifying Evans Delivery Company as Corporate Parent, filed.(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4)
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 11th Judicial District Court, Harris County, TX, case number 2020-78259 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25787079) filed by National Drayage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Index of State Court Filings and Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1A - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit 1B - Request for Issuance of Service, #4 Exhibit 1C - Citation to NDS, #5 Exhibit D - Return of Service on NDS, #6 Exhibit 1E - Return of Service on AWS, #7 Exhibit 1F - CMRRR Undeliverable to DGX, #8 Exhibit 1G - NDS's Original Answer, #9 Exhibit 2 - List of All Counsel of Record, #10 Exhibit 3 - AWS BOL, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henry, Vic)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ornare Houston, LLC v. National Drayage Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ornare Houston, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Russell Roberts
Represented By: Nomaan K Husain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DGX-Dependable Global Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Drayage Services, LLC
Represented By: Vic Houston Henry
Represented By: Emileigh Stewart Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?