Fontenot v. Union Pacific Railroad
Plaintiff: Michiel Fontenot
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD, Individually, and as Successor-in-Interest to SOUTHERN PACIFIC TRANSPORTATION COMPANY and Union Pacific Railroad
Case Number: 4:2021cv00126
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Michiel Fontenot, filed.(Vickery, Arnold)
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Pacific Railroad, filed.(Hudson, Gregory)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Union Pacific Railroad, filed.(Hudson, Gregory)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Union Pacific Railroad served on 2/4/2021, answer due 2/25/2021, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Union Pacific Railroad. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Michiel Fontenot, filed.(Vickery, Arnold)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 Corrected AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Union Pacific Railroad filed by Michiel Fontenot. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Michiel Fontenot.(Vickery, Arnold)
January 15, 2021 Per attorney this case is intended to be a Houston case ***, filed. (JacquelineMata, 4)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD, Individually, and as Successor-in-Interest to SOUTHERN PACIFIC TRANSPORTATION COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25811265) filed by Michiel Fontenot. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vickery, Arnold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fontenot v. Union Pacific Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD, Individually, and as Successor-in-Interest to SOUTHERN PACIFIC TRANSPORTATION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad
Represented By: Gregory S Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michiel Fontenot
Represented By: Arnold Anderson (Andy) Vickery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?