Caballero v. Vitol, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Caballero
Debtor: The Norte Del Valle Cartel, Revolutionary Armed Forces of Colombia (FARC), Fuerzas Armadas Revolucionarias De Colombia, Revolutionary Armed Forces of Colombia and FARC-EP
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Vitol, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: LDC Supply International, LLC and Rosneft Trading, S.A.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00140
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 45 REPLY in Support of Motion to Dissolve the December 23, 2020 Writ of Garnishment, to Vacate the Underlying Order Directing Its Issuance, and for Other Relief, filed by Rosneft Trading, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix to Reply, #2 Evidentiary Objections)(Oakes, Mark)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Steve M. Dollar to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
March 10, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE /Letter to Judge Andrew Hanen by LDC Supply International, LLC, filed. (Gottlieb, Michael)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Michael Gottlieb to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
March 9, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Garnishee's Response to Caballero's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Antonio Caballero, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Fasthoff, Henry)
March 8, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for Michael Gottlieb to Appear Pro Hac Vice by LDC Supply International, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2021. (Gottlieb, Michael)
March 8, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Antonio Caballero, filed. (Fasthoff, Henry)
March 5, 2021 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment, filed by Antonio Caballero. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix to Response, #2 Exhibit Evidentiary Objections)(Fasthoff, Henry)
March 4, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Antonio Caballero, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Fasthoff, Henry)
March 3, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time File Reply to Garnishee's Response to Caballero's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Antonio Caballero, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fasthoff, Henry)
February 26, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for Steve M. Dollar to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rosneft Trading, S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/19/2021. (Oakes, Mark)
February 26, 2021 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rosneft Trading, S.A. identifying Rosneft Oil Company as Corporate Parent, filed.(Oakes, Mark)
February 26, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE /Letter to Judge Andrew Hanen by Rosneft Trading, S.A., filed. (Oakes, Mark)
February 26, 2021 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Mark Oakes in Support of Rosneft Trading, S.A.'s Motion to Dissolve the December 23, 2020 Writ of Garnishment, to Vacate the Underlying Order Directing Its Issuance, and for Other Relief, filed.(Oakes, Mark)
February 26, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION - Third-Party Respondent Rosneft Trading, S.A.'s Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit on Its Motion to Dissolve the December 23, 2020 Writ of Garnishment, to Vacate the Underlying Order Directing Its Issuance, and for Other Relief by Rosneft Trading, S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - The Rule 664a Motion, #2 Exhibit B - The Appendix to 664a motion)(Oakes, Mark)
February 26, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Oakes on behalf of Rosneft Trading, S.A., filed. (Oakes, Mark)
February 23, 2021 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition to #19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Vitol, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Madriz, Yasser)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time. Response deadline to Garnishee's interpleader counterclaim is March 4, 2021..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
February 11, 2021 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Rosneft Trading, S.A. served on 2/5/2021, answer due 5/6/2021, filed.(Madriz, Yasser)
February 11, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Garnishee's Interpleader Counterclaim by Antonio Caballero, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fasthoff, Henry)
February 11, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to LDC Supply International, LLC served on 2/5/2021, answer due 4/6/2021, filed.(Madriz, Yasser)
February 4, 2021 Filing 24 Letter correcting typographical error in citation to case cited in Caballero's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Antonio Caballero, filed.(Fasthoff, Henry)
February 4, 2021 Filing 23 Letter transmitting hard copy of Garnishor's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and exhibits by Antonio Caballero, filed.(Fasthoff, Henry)
February 4, 2021 Filing 22 Corrected PROPOSED ORDER re: #19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed.(Fasthoff, Henry)
February 4, 2021 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Leon Patricios re: #7 Answer to State Court Petition/Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim, filed.(Fasthoff, Henry)
February 3, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Vitol, Inc., filed.(Madriz, Yasser)
February 2, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Antonio Caballero, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix with Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order Judgment in Garnishment)(Fasthoff, Henry)
February 1, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Antonio Caballero, filed.(Fasthoff, Henry)
January 29, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to LDC Supply International, LLC, Rosneft Trading, S.A.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ChristopherSarrat, 4)
January 28, 2021 Filing 16 Request for Issuance of Summons as to LDC Supply International, LLC, Rosneft Trading, S.A., filed. (Attachments: #1 Third Party Summons LDC Supply)(Madriz, Yasser)
January 28, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE Designation of Lead Counsel by Antonio Caballero, filed. (Fasthoff, Henry)
January 28, 2021 Summons Not Issued as to LDC Supply International, LLC, Rosneft Trading, S.A. Incorrect Summons form submitted. Please submit form AO 441, Summons on Third-Party Complaint. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Jason H. Cowley to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leon Patricios to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Joseph Zumpano to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
January 27, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Issuance of Summons as to LDC Supply International, LLC, Rosneft Trading, S.A., filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action)(Madriz, Yasser)
January 26, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leon Patricios to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Antonio Caballero, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2021. (Fasthoff, Henry)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Joseph Zumpano to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Antonio Caballero, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2021. (Fasthoff, Henry)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Alex J. Brackett to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Antonio Caballero, LDC Supply International, LLC, Rosneft Trading, S.A., COUNTERCLAIM against Antonio Caballero by Vitol, Inc., filed.(Madriz, Yasser)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Litigation by Antonio Caballero, filed. (Fasthoff, Henry)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Supplement to Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal,, by Vitol, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit Supplemental Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit Supplemental Exhibit I)(Madriz, Yasser)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Jason H. Cowley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Vitol, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/5/2021. (Madriz, Yasser)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Alex J. Brackett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Vitol, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/5/2021. (Madriz, Yasser)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 284th Judicial District Court of Montgomery County, case number 20-12-15427 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25814643) filed by Vitol, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Unredacted attachment Certificate of Service in Removed Action, #12 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Madriz, Yasser)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caballero v. Vitol, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: The Norte Del Valle Cartel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Revolutionary Armed Forces of Colombia (FARC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Fuerzas Armadas Revolucionarias De Colombia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Revolutionary Armed Forces of Colombia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: FARC-EP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Vitol, Inc.
Represented By: Yasser A Madriz
Represented By: Jason H Cowley
Represented By: Alex J Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: LDC Supply International, LLC
Represented By: Michael Julian Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Rosneft Trading, S.A.
Represented By: Mark T Oakes
Represented By: Steve M Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Caballero
Represented By: Leon N. Patricios
Represented By: Henry James Fasthoff, IV
Represented By: Joseph I. Zumpano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?