Odems v. Polaris Experience, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Rodtralle C. Odems
Defendant: Polaris Experience, L.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00178
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO REPORT. By August 27, 2021, the parties must jointly report to the court the status of arbitration. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
April 23, 2021 Filing 10 Alternative Dispute Resolution STATUS REPORT by Polaris Experience, L.L.C.. Have parties agreed to mediate? Yes. Name of mediator: Danielle Comeaux, filed.(Ford, Troy)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STAYING CASE terminating #7 . By 4/23/2021, the parties must jointly report the status of the arbitration. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 Minute Entry for INITIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 2/22/2021. Order to be entered. Internal review set for 4/26/2021. Appearances: Donald DeSimone, Jake McClellan. (Court Reporter: H. Alcaraz) (ghassan, 4)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 Agreed MOTION to Stay The Case Pending Arbitration by Polaris Experience, L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Voluntary Waiver, Consent, Release, and Hold Harmless Agreement, #2 Proposed Order Order Granting Agreed Motion to Stay Case Pending Arbitration)(McClellan, Michael)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order: Initial Conference set for 2/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
January 30, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Rodtralle C. Odems, filed.(Chapin, David)
January 30, 2021 Filing 4 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Rodtralle C. Odems, filed.(Chapin, David)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Rodtralle C. Odems, filed.(DeSimone, Donald)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2021-00782 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25827804) filed by Polaris Experience, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ford, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odems v. Polaris Experience, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polaris Experience, L.L.C.
Represented By: Troy Ray Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodtralle C. Odems
Represented By: Donald George DeSimone
Represented By: David Emmett Chapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?