American Sentinel Insurance Company v. Getit-N-Go Transportation, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: American Sentinel Insurance Company
Defendant: TURKISA HARRIS-SHAW and GETIT-N-GO TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00191
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Turkisa Harris-Shaw served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Melendi, Stephen)
March 3, 2021 CONTINUATION OF ENTRY #10 FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time Initial Conference reset for 5/5/2021 at 09:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time in Order for Conference and Disclosure of Interested Parties by American Sentinel Insurance Company, filed.(Melendi, Stephen)
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by American Sentinel Insurance Company, filed.(Melendi, Stephen)
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time in Order for Conference and Disclosure of Interested Parties by American Sentinel Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melendi, Stephen)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Getit-N-Go Transportation, LLC served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021, filed.(Melendi, Stephen)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 05/06/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 04/06/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 11/02/2021. Deft Expert Report due by 12/02/2021. Discovery due by 01/18/2022. Mediation due by 04/06/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 02/17/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 02/17/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 05/06/2022. Docket Call set for 06/20/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jengonzalezadi) (Entered: 02/03/2021)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 09:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4)
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ShadiaNash, 4)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(Melendi, Stephen)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25831546) filed by American Sentinel Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melendi, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Sentinel Insurance Company v. Getit-N-Go Transportation, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURKISA HARRIS-SHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GETIT-N-GO TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Sentinel Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen A Melendi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?