Oriental Fleet Tanker 02 Limited v. M/V Folegandros, its engines, boilers, tackle, furniture, apparel, appurtenances, etc., in rem et al
Plaintiff: Oriental Fleet Tanker 02 Limited
Defendant: Folegandros Shipping Corporation, in personam and M/V Folegandros, its engines, boilers, tackle, furniture, apparel, appurtenances, etc., in rem
Case Number: 4:2021cv00249
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Folegandros Shipping Corporation, in personam, filed.(Georgantas, Dimitri)
February 9, 2021 Filing 18 STATEMENT of Right or Interest and Entry of Restricted Appearance to Defend Vessel In Rem by Folegandros Shipping Corporation, in personam, filed.(Georgantas, Dimitri)
February 1, 2021 Filing 17 RETURN of Service Executed as to Travis Davies on 1/26/2021 re: Substitute custodian agreemement, filed.(jdav, 4)
February 1, 2021 Filing 16 RETURN of Service Executed as to Captain Manthos Thalassinos Stavros on 1/26/2021 re: Arrest Warrant, issuance of arrest warrant and complaint, filed.(jdav, 4)
February 1, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN of Service Executed as to Captian Manthos Thalassinos Stavros on 1/26/2021 re: Maritime arrest/complaint, filed.(jdav, 4)
January 29, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Folegandros Shipping Corporation, in personam. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Jane Freeberg Sarma to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Alice D. Colarossi to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
January 28, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Folegandros Shipping Corporation, in personam, filed.(Cooper, J)
January 27, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Alice D. Colarossi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Oriental Fleet Tanker 02 Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/17/2021. (Cooper, J)
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Jane M. Sarma to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Oriental Fleet Tanker 02 Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/17/2021. (Cooper, J)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Emergency.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Emergency..(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 EMERGENCY MOTION by Oriental Fleet Tanker 02 Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Cooper, J)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Oriental Fleet Tanker 02 Limited identifying Oriental Fleet International Company Limited, wholly-owned subsidiary of COSCO SHIPPING Development Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Cooper, J)
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian by Oriental Fleet Tanker 02 Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, J)
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 Ex Parte EMERGENCY MOTION by Oriental Fleet Tanker 02 Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Issuance and Execution of Warrant of Arrest, #2 Proposed Warrant of Arrest)(Cooper, J)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25862379) filed by Oriental Fleet Tanker 02 Limited. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cooper, J)
January 26, 2021 Arrest WARRANT issued ( Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon), filed.(sjones, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oriental Fleet Tanker 02 Limited v. M/V Folegandros, its engines, boilers, tackle, furniture, apparel, appurtenances, etc., in rem et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Folegandros Shipping Corporation, in personam
Represented By: Dimitri P Georgantas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Folegandros, its engines, boilers, tackle, furniture, apparel, appurtenances, etc., in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oriental Fleet Tanker 02 Limited
Represented By: J James Cooper
Represented By: Alice D Colarossi
Represented By: Jane Freeberg Sarma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?