Hebert v. McDermott International Inc et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Lawrence Hebert, Jr.
Defendant: McDermott, Inc., J. Ray McDermott, Inc., J. Ray McDermott S.A. and McDermott International Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv00254
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 883
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by J. Ray McDermott S.A., J. Ray McDermott, Inc., McDermott International Inc, McDermott, Inc., filed.(Gallant, Walter)
March 26, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by J. Ray McDermott S.A., J. Ray McDermott, Inc., McDermott International Inc, McDermott, Inc., filed.(Gallant, Walter)
February 20, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to J. Ray McDermott S.A. served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021; J. Ray McDermott, Inc. served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021; McDermott International Inc served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021; McDermott, Inc. served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Dennis, Patrick)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Joseph G. Jevic, III, to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Christopher J. St. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Charles C. Bourque, Jr., to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 4/19/2021 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Joseph Jevic to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Arthur Lawrence Hebert, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2021. (Dennis, Patrick)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Christopher J. St. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Arthur Lawrence Hebert, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2021. (Dennis, Patrick)
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Charles Bourque, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Arthur Lawrence Hebert, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2021. (Dennis, Patrick)
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case by Arthur Lawrence Hebert, Jr, filed. (Dennis, Patrick)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25865935) filed by Arthur Lawrence Hebert, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dennis, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hebert v. McDermott International Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Lawrence Hebert, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Mason Dennis
Represented By: Joseph G Jevic, III
Represented By: Christopher J. St. Martin
Represented By: Charles Bourque, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDermott, Inc.
Represented By: Walter Joseph Gallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ray McDermott, Inc.
Represented By: Walter Joseph Gallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ray McDermott S.A.
Represented By: Walter Joseph Gallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDermott International Inc
Represented By: Walter Joseph Gallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?