DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH et al v. Nexus Perforating LLC
Plaintiff: DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH and DynaEnergetics US, Inc.
Defendant: Nexus Perforating LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00280
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Stephanie Nguyen to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Lisa J. Moyles to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #13 Motion for Jason M. Rockman to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Julie C. Giardina to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Preston Heard to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Barry Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
March 1, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Jason M. Rockman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2021. (Moore, Megan)
March 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Lisa J. Moyles to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2021. (Moore, Megan)
March 1, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Stephanie Nguyen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2021. (Moore, Megan)
March 1, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Julie C. Giardina to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2021. (Moore, Megan)
March 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Preston H. Heard to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2021. (Moore, Megan)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Barry J. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2021. (Moore, Megan)
February 18, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Nexus Perforating LLC served on 2/17/2021, answer due 4/19/2021, filed.(Moore, Megan)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nexus Perforating LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4)
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc. identifying DMC Global Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Moore, Megan)
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Nexus Perforating LLC, filed.(Moore, Megan)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nexus Perforating LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25878311) filed by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH et al v. Nexus Perforating LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH
Represented By: Megan Charlotte Moore
Represented By: Lisa J. Moyles
Represented By: Julie C. Giardina
Represented By: Stephanie Nguyen
Represented By: Barry Jeff Herman
Represented By: Preston H Heard
Represented By: Jason M. Rockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DynaEnergetics US, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Charlotte Moore
Represented By: Lisa J. Moyles
Represented By: Julie C. Giardina
Represented By: Stephanie Nguyen
Represented By: Barry Jeff Herman
Represented By: Preston H Heard
Represented By: Jason M. Rockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexus Perforating LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?