Harris v. U.S. Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Michael Harris
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00440
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order)(Vilt, Robert)
March 2, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Gray, Travis)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Bank, N.A., filed.(Gray, Travis)
February 13, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by U.S. Bank, N.A., filed.(Gray, Travis)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 506th District Court, Waller County, Texas, case number CV21-01-0092 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25940469) filed by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gray, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Harris
Represented By: Robert Clayton Vilt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Travis Hegar Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?