Westlake OIG, LLC v. Parker et al
Plaintiff: Westlake OIG, LLC
Defendant: Clifford R Shows, Plast LLC, Roosevelt Trey Daniels, III, Lydia LaFleur, Robert C Arledge, Frank L Parker, Jr., Frank L. Parker Jr. LLC and Randall G. Wells
Case Number: 4:2021cv00450
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint Rule 12(b)(6) by Roosevelt Trey Daniels, III, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wauson, John)
April 7, 2021 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed.(Wauson, John)
April 6, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Lydia LaFleur, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wauson, John)
March 25, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to #19 MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Robert C Arledge, Frank L. Parker Jr. LLC, Frank L Parker, Jr, Plast LLC, Clifford R Shows, Randall G. Wells. (Benton, Thomas)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Thomas H. Benton, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
March 19, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition to #19 MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Westlake OIG, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Lurich, Ryan)
March 15, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Robert C Arledge, Roosevelt Trey Daniels, III, Frank L. Parker Jr. LLC, Frank L Parker, Jr, Plast LLC, Clifford R Shows, Randall G. Wells, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2021. (mmapps, 4)
March 15, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas H Benton, Jr on behalf of Robert C Arledge, Roosevelt Trey Daniels, III, Frank L. Parker Jr. LLC, Frank L Parker, Jr, Plast LLC, Clifford R Shows, Randall G. Wells, filed. (mmapps, 4)
March 15, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Thomas H. Benton, JR to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert C Arledge, Frank L. Parker Jr. LLC, Frank L Parker, Jr, Plast LLC, Clifford R Shows, Randall G. Wells, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2021. (mmapps, 4)
March 11, 2021 Filing 16 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Clifford R Shows served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021, filed.(Lurich, Ryan)
March 11, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Lydia LaFleur served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021, filed.(Lurich, Ryan)
March 11, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Plast LLC served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/23/2021, filed.(Lurich, Ryan)
March 11, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Plast LLC served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021, filed.(Lurich, Ryan)
March 11, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Robert C Arledge served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021, filed.(Lurich, Ryan)
March 11, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Roosevelt Trey Daniels, III served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021, filed.(Lurich, Ryan)
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Randall G. Wells served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021, filed.(Lurich, Ryan)
March 11, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION re: Extension of Time to Answer or File A Responsive Pleading by Roosevelt Trey Daniels, III, filed.(Wauson, John)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Robert C Arledge. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Robert C Arledge, filed.(Lurich, Ryan)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Roosevelt Trey Daniels, III, Frank L. Parker Jr. LLC, Lydia LaFleur, Frank L Parker, Jr, Plast LLC, Clifford R Shows, Randall G. Wells. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Parker,Jr, #2 Summons-Shows, #3 Summons-LeFleur, #4 Summons-Plast LLC-Wing, #5 Summons-Plast LLC-Wells, #6 Summons-Wells, #7 Summons-Daniels)(rguerrero, 4)
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation, #3 Continuation, #4 Continuation, #5 Continuation, #6 Continuation, #7 Continuation)(Lurich, Ryan)
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Westlake OIG, LLC, filed.(Friedman, Jason)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 Other EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Westlake OIG, LLC, filed.(Lurich, Ryan)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Westlake OIG, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25944779) filed by Westlake OIG, LLC.(Lurich, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westlake OIG, LLC v. Parker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlake OIG, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Kenneth Lurich
Represented By: Jason Howard Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford R Shows
Represented By: Thomas H Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plast LLC
Represented By: Thomas H Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roosevelt Trey Daniels, III
Represented By: John Wesley Wauson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lydia LaFleur
Represented By: John Wesley Wauson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C Arledge
Represented By: Thomas H Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank L Parker, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas H Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank L. Parker Jr. LLC
Represented By: Thomas H Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall G. Wells
Represented By: Thomas H Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?