Pedder Jr. v. Marquez et al
Plaintiff: David Clifford Pedder Jr.
Defendant: Rachel A. Whitney, Marlen Marquez and C. S. Deigle
Case Number: 4:2021cv00494
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Partial Filing Fee as to David Clifford Pedder, Jr.; Granting #4 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) **** copy emailed to Inmate Trust Fund
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by David Clifford Pedder Jr., filed. (ChristopherSarrat, 4)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by David Clifford Pedder Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/12/2021. (ChristopherSarrat, 4)
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to David Clifford Pedder Jr.. Parties notified Notice of Compliance due by 3/24/2021, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (bgoolsby, 4)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ChristopherSarrat, 4)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402) filed by David Clifford Pedder Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(ChristopherSarrat, 4) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/29/2021) (bgoolsby, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pedder Jr. v. Marquez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel A. Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlen Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. S. Deigle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Clifford Pedder Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?