Perry-Monroe et al v. Mitchem
Plaintiff: Susan Perry Monroe, Donald Currie and Susan Perry-Monroe
Defendant: Mark Mitchem
Case Number: 4:2021cv00612
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 5 days. Non-Jury. Joinder of Parties due by 6/30/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2021. Pltf Expert Report due by 9/24/2021. Deft Expert Report due by 10/25/2021. Mediation due by 11/1/2021. Discovery due by 11/24/2021. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/24/2021. Objections due by 2/1/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/25/2022. Docket Call set for 3/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9D before Judge Gray H Miller. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified. (aarcher, 4)
April 20, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Remand, filed by Mark Mitchem. (Brown, James)
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Susan Perry-Monroe, filed.(Rhine, Eric)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Granting #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Submission Date ; the submission date for Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and is now April 20, 2021. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Submission Date by Mark Mitchem, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, James)
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Donald Currie, Susan Perry-Monroe, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rhine, Eric)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mark Mitchem, filed.(Brown, James)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Donald Currie, Susan Perry-Monroe, filed.(Rhine, Eric)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Mark Mitchem, filed.(Brown, James)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 4/16/2021(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County, case number 2021-04361 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26019076) filed by Mark Mitchem. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Goodwin, Jeanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry-Monroe et al v. Mitchem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Perry Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Currie
Represented By: Marcus Raymond Spagnoletti
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Rhine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Perry-Monroe
Represented By: Marcus Raymond Spagnoletti
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Rhine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Mitchem
Represented By: Jeanie Tate Goodwin
Represented By: James T Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?