Contreras v. Walmart Stores Texas, LLC
Plaintiff: Beatrice Contreras a/n/f S.C. and Beatrice Contreras
Defendant: Walmart Stores Texas, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00924
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 ***Delivery Confirmation for delivery date(s) 5/7/2021 re: 13 Document(s) Sent, filed. (dhansen, 4)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #10 Motion to Remand. Case has been remanded to Harris County Civil Court at Law No. 2 Cause No. 1164212.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
May 4, 2021 Filing 11 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER OF REMAND, filed.(Spivey, Karen)
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Beatrice Contreras, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Murrill, Rashon)
April 7, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Beatrice Contreras, filed.(Murrill, Rashon)
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Walmart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Spivey, Karen)
March 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Gray H Miller. Judge David Hittner no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (olindor, 4)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge David Hittner recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/2/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Spivey, Karen)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walmart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Spivey, Karen)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Spivey, Karen)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law No. 2 of Harris County, Texas, case number 1164212 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26146075) filed by Walmart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Citation of Service and Notice of Service of Process on Walmart Stores Texas, LLC, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Petition and Answer, #4 Exhibit C - Orders Signed by State Judge, #5 Exhibit D - Index of Matters Being Filed, #6 Exhibit E - Docket Sheet, #7 Exhibit F - List of All Counsel of Record)(Spivey, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. Walmart Stores Texas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Contreras a/n/f S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Contreras
Represented By: Alan Robert Kolodny
Represented By: Rashon Maurice Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores Texas, LLC
Represented By: Karen Lee Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?