Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas v. Nidec Motor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Chubb Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas and Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas
Defendant: Nidec Motor Corporation fka Emerson Electric Co., Lennox Industries Inc., Nidec Motor Corporation and Emerson Electric Co.
Case Number: 4:2021cv01057
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 13 Amended CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas identifying Federal Insurance Company; Chubb INA Holdings, Inc; Chubb Group Holdings, Inc.; Chubb Limited as Corporate Parent, filed.(Schulze, Jason)
May 19, 2021 Filing 12 OBJECTIONS to #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement , filed by Nidec Motor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Stepp, Nicholas)
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's re: #9 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas, filed. (Schulze, Jason)
May 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Calvert, II on behalf of Lennox Industries Inc., filed. (Calvert, William)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schulze, Jason)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Lennox Industries Inc., filed.(Donato, Randy)
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Answer by Nidec Motor Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/11/2021. (Stepp, Nicholas)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nidec Motor Corporation, filed.(Stepp, Nicholas)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Nidec Motor Corporation served on 4/12/2021, answer due 5/3/2021, filed.(Schulze, Jason)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Lennox Industries Inc. served on 4/9/2021, answer due 4/30/2021, filed.(Schulze, Jason)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas identifying Chubb INA Holdings, Inc; Chubb Group Holdings, Inc.; Chubb Limited; Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Schulze, Jason)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/6/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 333rd JDC, Harris County, Texas, case number 2021-18422 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26199731) filed by Nidec Motor Corporation fka Emerson Electric Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Stepp, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas v. Nidec Motor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chubb Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas
Represented By: Jason Steven Schulze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nidec Motor Corporation fka Emerson Electric Co.
Represented By: Nicholas David Stepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennox Industries Inc.
Represented By: Randy Donato
Represented By: William Ernest Calvert, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nidec Motor Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas David Stepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson Electric Co.
Represented By: Nicholas David Stepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?