Ovalle v. American Petroleum Tankers IV LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rogelio Ovalle
Defendant: Intrepid Ship Management, Inc., American Petroleum Tankers IV LLC, HFOTCO LLC doing business as Houston Fuel Oil Terminal Company, Bulk Uruguay Shipping Ltd. and C Transport Maritime S.A.M. Monaco
Case Number: 4:2021cv01125
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/11/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Judge David Hittner for all further proceedings. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
May 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (leddins, 4)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RECUSAL ORDER. Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
May 20, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Rogelio Ovalle, filed.(Lee, Joshua)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Continuance Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
May 20, 2021 Filing 7 Agreed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Conference by Rogelio Ovalle, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Continuance)(Lee, Joshua)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Plaintiffs deadline to file his motion to remand on any defect other than lack of subject matter jurisdiction is extended to July 5, 2021. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan M. Rodriguez on behalf of HFOTCO LLC, filed. (Rodriguez, Ivan)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION re: Extending Time to File Motion for Remand by Rogelio Ovalle, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation)(Lee, Joshua)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 6/3/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Bulk Uruguay Shipping Ltd., C Transport Maritime S.A.M. Monaco, filed.(Swanson, Marshall)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Harris County 11th Judicial District, case number 2021-12746 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26232877) filed by American Petroleum Tankers IV LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Lightsey, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ovalle v. American Petroleum Tankers IV LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intrepid Ship Management, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas N Lightsey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Petroleum Tankers IV LLC
Represented By: Thomas N Lightsey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HFOTCO LLC doing business as Houston Fuel Oil Terminal Company
Represented By: Andrew Robert Nash
Represented By: Ivan M Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bulk Uruguay Shipping Ltd.
Represented By: Marshall Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Transport Maritime S.A.M. Monaco
Represented By: Marshall Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio Ovalle
Represented By: Joshua D. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?