Olicia v. The Methodist Hospital
Plaintiff: Amanda Olicia
Defendant: The Methodist Hospital d/b/a Houston Methodist Hospital and The Methodist Hospital doing business as Houston Methodist Hospital
Case Number: 4:2021cv01184
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 7/9/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 7/9/2021 Mediation due by 10/29/2021. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/12/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/14/2022. Docket Call set for 1/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
June 3, 2021 Filing 13 Minute entry for proceedings before the Hon. Lee H. Rosenthal. Initial conference held on June 3, 2021. The court entered a scheduling and docket control order, as stated on the record. Appearances: Lisa Ventress, Brooke Jones, Daniel Patton.(Court Reporter: H. Alcaraz), filed.(leddins, 4)
May 26, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER , filed.(Patton, Daniel)
May 26, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by The Methodist Hospital, filed.(Patton, Daniel)
May 24, 2021 Filing 10 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Amanda Olicia, filed.(Ventress, Lisa)
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Amanda Olicia, filed.(Ventress, Lisa)
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Methodist Hospital, filed.(Patton, Daniel)
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by The Methodist Hospital, filed.(Patton, Daniel)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #4 Stipulation ; Answer due for The Methodist Hospital 5/10/2021(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke Jones on behalf of The Methodist Hospital, filed. (Jones, Brooke)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION re: Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Methodist Hospital, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Stipulation)(Patton, Daniel)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 6/3/2021 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2021: #1 Supplement) (leddins, 4).
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 157th Judicial District Court, case number 2021-10010 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26261578) filed by The Methodist Hospital d/b/a Houston Methodist Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Patton, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olicia v. The Methodist Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Methodist Hospital d/b/a Houston Methodist Hospital
Represented By: Daniel F. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Methodist Hospital doing business as Houston Methodist Hospital
Represented By: Daniel F. Patton
Represented By: Brooke Elizabeth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Olicia
Represented By: Lisa Elizabeth Ventress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?