Mills et al v. United Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Levi C. Mills, Jeremy M. Mills, April C. Webb and Kimberly F. Mills
Defendant: Antonio DeLeon, ExpressJet Airlines, Inc., Prystal Milton, ABM Aviation, Inc., United Airlines, Inc., Jessica Mora, Simplicity Ground Services, LLC d/b/a Simplicity USA and Simplicity Ground Services, LLC doing business as Simplicity USA
Case Number: 4:2021cv01241
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to #11 MOTION to Remand, filed by April C. Webb. (Ammons, Robert)
June 4, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to #11 MOTION to Remand, filed by ABM Aviation, Inc., Antonio DeLeon, ExpressJet Airlines, Inc., Prystal Milton, Jessica Mora, Simplicity Ground Services, LLC, United Airlines, Inc.. (Rose, Marc)
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Jeremy M. Mills, Kimberly F. Mills, Levi C. Mills, April C. Webb, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Ammons, Robert)
May 12, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Simplicity Ground Services, LLC, filed.(Stepp, Jad)
May 12, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United Airlines, Inc., filed.(Stepp, Jad)
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ABM Aviation, Inc., Antonio DeLeon, Prystal Milton, Jessica Mora, filed.(Rose, Marc)
May 4, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ExpressJet Airlines, Inc., filed.(Comerford, Patrick)
April 30, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jeremy M. Mills, Kimberly F. Mills, Levi C. Mills, April C. Webb, filed.(Ammons, Robert)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by ExpressJet Airlines, Inc., filed.(Comerford, Patrick)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(hlermaadi, 4)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ABM Aviation, Inc. identifying ABM Industries, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Rose, Marc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ExpressJet Airlines, Inc. identifying ManaAir, LLC as Corporate Parent, filed.(Comerford, Patrick)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 157th Judicial District Court, case number 2020-69428 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26281269) filed by ExpressJet Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 List of Counsel and Parties)(Comerford, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills et al v. United Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio DeLeon
Represented By: Marc Michael Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExpressJet Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Comerford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prystal Milton
Represented By: Marc Michael Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Michael Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Jad J Stepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Mora
Represented By: Marc Michael Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplicity Ground Services, LLC d/b/a Simplicity USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplicity Ground Services, LLC doing business as Simplicity USA
Represented By: Jad J Stepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi C. Mills
Represented By: Robert Earl Ammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy M. Mills
Represented By: Robert Earl Ammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April C. Webb
Represented By: Robert Earl Ammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly F. Mills
Represented By: Justin David Burrow
Represented By: Robert Earl Ammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?