Rehco, LLC v. Amax Group USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rehco, LLC
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corp. and Amax Group USA, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv01278
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Clayton R. Henson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Nicholas M. Zovko to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
June 11, 2021 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Costco Wholesale Corp., filed.(Rogers, Charles)
June 11, 2021 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amax Group USA, LLC, filed.(Rogers, Charles)
June 11, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Clayton R. Henson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amax Group USA, LLC, Costco Wholesale Corp., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/2/2021. (Rogers, Charles)
June 11, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Nicholas M. Zovko to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amax Group USA, LLC, Costco Wholesale Corp., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/2/2021. (Rogers, Charles)
June 11, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, First COUNTERCLAIM against Rehco, LLC by Costco Wholesale Corp., Amax Group USA, LLC, filed.(Rogers, Charles)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Timothy E. Grochocinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for All Defendants.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
May 11, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Timothy E. Grochocinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rehco, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/1/2021. (Nelson, Edward)
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Rehco, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Amax Group USA, LLC served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021, filed.(Nelson, Edward)
April 23, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Costco Wholesale Corp. served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021, filed.(Nelson, Edward)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ShadiaNashadi, 4)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 7/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(DesireeSillas, 4)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Timothy E. Grochocinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rehco, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/7/2021. (Nelson, Edward)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing of Report of Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Rehco, LLC, filed. (Nelson, Edward)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rehco, LLC, filed.(Nelson, Edward)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Amax Group USA, LLC, Costco Wholesale Corp., filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement additional Summons)(Nelson, Edward)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amax Group USA, LLC, Costco Wholesale Corp. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26292439) filed by Rehco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-'866 Patent, #2 Exhibit 2-, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rehco, LLC v. Amax Group USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corp.
Represented By: Charles John Rogers
Represented By: Nicholas Z. Zovko
Represented By: Clayton R. Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amax Group USA, LLC
Represented By: Charles John Rogers
Represented By: Nicholas Z. Zovko
Represented By: Clayton R. Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rehco, LLC
Represented By: Edward Reese Nelson, III
Represented By: Timothy E Grochocinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?