Trad v. Fortunato
Plaintiff: ROBERTO SIMAO TRAD
Defendant: VALERIA RIBEIRO FORTUNATO
Case Number: 4:2021cv01350
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Douglas Ray York to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Douglas York to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Valeria Ribeiro Fortunato, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/8/2021. (ckrus, 4)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 ORIGINAL ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #1 Complaint by Valeria Ribeiro Fortunato, filed.(ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 8/27/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Valeria Ribeiro Fortunato. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to VALERIA RIBEIRO FORTUNATO, filed.(Sibley, Joseph)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VALERIA RIBEIRO FORTUNATO (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26329555) filed by ROBERTO SIMAO TRAD.(Sibley, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trad v. Fortunato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERTO SIMAO TRAD
Represented By: Joseph David Sibley, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALERIA RIBEIRO FORTUNATO
Represented By: Douglas Ray York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?