Seaux v. Unique System LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Seaux
Defendant: Nirav Jambusaria, Uni-Forge LLC, Kevin Middendorf, Unique System LLC and Syed Taqvi
Case Number: 4:2021cv01405
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Uni-Forge LLC, Unique System LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Kraft, Ralph)
May 27, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Kenneth Seaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hubbard, Kristine)
May 12, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Nirav Jambusaria, Syed Taqvi, Uni-Forge LLC, Unique System LLC, filed.(Kraft, Ralph)
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by Nirav Jambusaria, Syed Taqvi, Uni-Forge LLC, Unique System LLC, filed.(Kraft, Ralph)
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 Amended CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Uni-Forge LLC identifying Unique System Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Kraft, Ralph)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 Amended CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Unique System LLC identifying Unique System Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Kraft, Ralph)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from DISTRICT COURT OF HARRIS COUNTY TX, case number 2021-19120 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26359862) filed by Unique System LLC, Nirav Jambusaria, Syed Taqvi, Uni-Forge LLC, Kevin Middendorf. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 CONSENT TO REMOVAL, #8 CONSENT TO REMOVAL, #9 CONSENT TO REMOVAL, #10 DOCKET SHEET, #11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, #12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, #13 LIST OF COUNSEL OF RECORD, #14 INDEX OF MATTERS BEING FILED)(Kraft, Ralph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seaux v. Unique System LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Seaux
Represented By: Kristine Bancroft Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nirav Jambusaria
Represented By: Ralph E Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uni-Forge LLC
Represented By: Ralph E Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Middendorf
Represented By: Ralph E Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unique System LLC
Represented By: Ralph E Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syed Taqvi
Represented By: Ralph E Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?