Everett v. Andrew Saul et al
Plaintiff: Joseph B Everett
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2021cv01535
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Referring Judge: Frances H Stacy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jennifer Lowery U.S. Attorney. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hlerma, 4)
May 20, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned via NEF, filed.(DesireeSillas, 4)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(DesireeSillas, 4) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/20/2021) (DesireeSillas, 4).
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(DesireeSillas, 4) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/12/2021) (DesireeSillas, 4). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/12/2021) (DesireeSillas, 4).
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Andrew Saul, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Complaint)(Andrews, James)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26411770) filed by Joseph B Everett .(Andrews, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everett v. Andrew Saul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph B Everett
Represented By: James Foster Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?