Wells Fargo Bank, National Association v. Bering Drive 2000, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee on Behalf of the Registered Holders of CSAIL 2015-C1 Commercial Mortgage Trust, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 015-C1 and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Defendant: Bering Drive 2000, Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2021cv01601
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by Rick Vita, filed.(Blackwell, Robert)
June 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian B. Kilpatrick on behalf of Bering Drive 2000, Ltd., filed. (Kilpatrick, Brian)
June 1, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, filed.(Banks, Kathleen)
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 OATH OF RECEIVER by Rick Vita, filed.(Blackwell, Robert)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Entry of Order Appointing Receiver.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Appointing Receiver by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Atasi, Yasmin)
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Bering Drive 2000, Ltd. served on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021, filed.(Banks, Kathleen)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/29/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(DesireeSillasadi, 4)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bering Drive 2000, Ltd. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26441414) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee on Behalf of the Registered Holders of CSAIL 2015-C1 Commercial Mortgage Trust, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 015-C1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Atasi, Yasmin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association v. Bering Drive 2000, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bering Drive 2000, Ltd.
Represented By: Brian B. Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee on Behalf of the Registered Holders of CSAIL 2015-C1 Commercial Mortgage Trust, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 015-C1
Represented By: Yasmin Islam Atasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Yasmin Islam Atasi
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Bell Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?