UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $31,050.00 U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $31,050.00 U.S. Currency
Case Number: 4:2021cv01682
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Noh, John)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by $31,050.00 U.S. Currency, filed.(Tabakman, Gary)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Service of Complaint to Gary Tabakman)(Noh, John)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Service of Complaint to Rodney Crawford)(Noh, John)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Service of Complaint to Charles Hudson)(Noh, John)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 CLAIM filed by $31,050.00 U.S. Currency.(Tabakman, Gary)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Tabakman on behalf of $31,050.00 U.S. Currency, filed. (Tabakman, Gary)
May 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE Warrant of Arrest in Rem by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Noh, John)
May 28, 2021 Warrant of Arrest in Rem issued. (bthomas, 4)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $31,050.00 U.S. Currency filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Noh, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $31,050.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $31,050.00 U.S. Currency
Represented By: Gary Tabakman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: John Noh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?