Tianjin Bond USA, LLC et al v. Western Post (US) Inc et al
Plaintiff: BANGPING YU and TIANJIN BOND USA, LLC
Defendant: WESTERN POST (HOU) INC. f/k/a OW SOUTHWEST DISTRIBUTION INC, BIAO PENG, XIAOWEI WANG, WESTERN POST (US) INC f/k/a POWER IN CLOUD, INC., Western Post (US) Inc, Western Post (Hou) Inc., Power in Cloud, Inc. and OW Southwest Distribution Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv02013
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 27 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Correct or Modify Arbitration Award by Xiaowei Wang, Western Post (Hou) Inc., Western Post (US) Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Correct or Modify Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit A)(Ghafoor, Henna)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Striking Document re: #7 Motion for Leave to File Document, filed by Western Post (Hou) Inc., Western Post (US) Inc, Xiaowei Wang.The motion does not comply with the Courts Procedures section 6(C)(2), which requires a certificate of conference.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jegonzalez, 4)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Correct or Modify Arbitration Award by Xiaowei Wang, Western Post (Hou) Inc., Western Post (US) Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Correct or Modify Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit A)(Ghafoor, Henna)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Correct filed by Tianjin Bond USA, LLC, Bangping Yu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit B-1, #6 Exhibit B-2, #7 Exhibit B-3, #8 Exhibit B-4, #9 Exhibit B-5, #10 Exhibit C-1, #11 Exhibit C-2, #12 Exhibit C-3, #13 Exhibit C-4, #14 Proposed Order)(Ang, Victorio)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Correct by Biao Peng, Xiaowei Wang, Western Post (Hou) Inc., Western Post (US) Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Correct or Modify Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Ghafoor, Henna)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Biao Peng, Xiaowei Wang, Western Post (Hou) Inc., Western Post (US) Inc, filed.(Ghafoor, Henna)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Tianjin Bond USA, LLC, Bangping Yu, filed.(Ang, Victorio)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(lgouadi, 4)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2019-41299 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26618782) filed by BIAO PENG, WESTERN POST (HOU) INC. f/k/a OW SOUTHWEST DISTRIBUTION INC, WESTERN POST (US) INC f/k/a POWER IN CLOUD, INC., XIAOWEI WANG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ghafoor, Henna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tianjin Bond USA, LLC et al v. Western Post (US) Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTERN POST (HOU) INC. f/k/a OW SOUTHWEST DISTRIBUTION INC
Represented By: Henna Ghafoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIAO PENG
Represented By: Henna Ghafoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XIAOWEI WANG
Represented By: Henna Ghafoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTERN POST (US) INC f/k/a POWER IN CLOUD, INC.
Represented By: Henna Ghafoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Post (US) Inc
Represented By: Henna Ghafoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Post (Hou) Inc.
Represented By: Henna Ghafoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power in Cloud, Inc.
Represented By: Henna Ghafoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OW Southwest Distribution Inc
Represented By: Henna Ghafoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANGPING YU
Represented By: Wanchan Ohyan
Represented By: Victorio Nathaniel Ang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIANJIN BOND USA, LLC
Represented By: Wanchan Ohyan
Represented By: Victorio Nathaniel Ang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?