BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG v. Fluence Energy LLC et al
Plaintiff: BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG
Defendant: Fluence Energy LLC, Schenker, Inc. and Schenker Deutschland AG
Intervenor: SCHENKERocean, Ltd
3Rd Party Defendant: Fluence Energy, GmbH
Case Number: 4:2021cv02235
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1300
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Nolan on behalf of Fluence Energy LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haines, Julia)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Granting #14 Motion for Dixie T. Wells to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Fluence Energy LLC. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - Granting #13 Motion for Andrew S. Chamberlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Fluence Energy LLC; terminating #12 Motion for Andrew S. Chamberlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
August 30, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Dixie T. Wells to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fluence Energy LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/20/2021. (Haines, Julia)
August 30, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Andrew S. Chamberlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fluence Energy LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/20/2021. (Haines, Julia)
August 30, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Andrew S. Chamberlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fluence Energy LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/20/2021. (Haines, Julia)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion to Dismiss by Fluence Energy LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Haines, Julia)
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Fluence Energy LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haines, Julia)
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Fluence Energy LLC served on 7/13/2021, answer due 9/13/2021, filed.(Waguespack, Jason)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Fluence Energy LLC, Fluence Energy, GmbH. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JacquelineMata, 4)
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Fluence Energy LLC, Fluence Energy, GmbH, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(Hatzel, Cameron)
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron A. Hatzel on behalf of SCHENKERocean, Ltd, Schenker Deutschland AG, Schenker, Inc., filed. (Hatzel, Cameron)
July 18, 2021 Filing 5 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Fluence Energy, GmbH filed by SCHENKERocean, Ltd.(Bailey, James)
July 18, 2021 Filing 4 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against All Parties filed by SCHENKERocean, Ltd.(Bailey, James)
July 18, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Fluence Energy LLC by Schenker Deutschland AG, Schenker, Inc., filed.(Bailey, James)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/29/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fluence Energy LLC, Schenker Deutschland AG, Schenker, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26721674) filed by BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Waguespack, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG v. Fluence Energy LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG
Represented By: Jason P Waguespack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluence Energy LLC
Represented By: Julia M Haines
Represented By: Andrew S. Chamberlin
Represented By: Dixie T. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schenker, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron Hatzel
Represented By: James T. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schenker Deutschland AG
Represented By: Cameron Hatzel
Represented By: James T. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SCHENKERocean, Ltd
Represented By: James T. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Fluence Energy, GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?