Bulox et al v. CooperSurgical, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Giovanna Bulox and Matias Bulox
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc. and The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Lorena Ahiri Merlo and Daniel Merlo
Case Number: 4:2021cv02320
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Giovanna Bulox, Matias Bulox, Daniel Merlo, Lorena Ahiri Merlo, filed.(Purnell, Simon)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Daniel Merlo, Lorena Ahiri Merlo, filed.(Purnell, Simon)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Giovanna Bulox, Matias Bulox, filed.(Purnell, Simon)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 First AMENDED ANSWER to with Jury Demand by The Cooper Companies, Inc., filed. (Edgecomb, Clark)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 First AMENDED ANSWER to with Jury Demand by CooperSurgical, Inc., filed. (Edgecomb, Clark)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 First AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by The Cooper Companies, Inc., filed. (Edgecomb, Clark)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 First AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by CooperSurgical, Inc., filed. (Edgecomb, Clark)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc., filed.(Edgecomb, Clark)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Cooper Companies, Inc., filed.(Edgecomb, Clark)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Cooper Companies, Inc., filed.(Edgecomb, Clark)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Cooper Companies, Inc., filed.(Edgecomb, Clark)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by The Cooper Companies, Inc., filed.(Edgecomb, Clark)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to The Cooper Companies, Inc. served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021, filed.(Purnell, Simon)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to The Cooper Companies, Inc. served on 8/6/2021, answer due 8/27/2021, filed.(Purnell, Simon)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CooperSurgical, Inc. identifying The Cooper Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Edgecomb, Clark)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CooperSurgical, Inc., filed.(Edgecomb, Clark)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CooperSurgical, Inc. identifying The Cooper Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Edgecomb, Clark)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by CooperSurgical, Inc., filed.(Edgecomb, Clark)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES: Lead Case No. 4:21cv2320 and Member Case No. 4:21cv2321 terminating #8 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to CooperSurgical, Inc. served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021, filed.(Purnell, Simon)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Giovanna Bulox, Matias Bulox, filed.(Purnell, Simon)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Related or Similar Action by Giovanna Bulox, Matias Bulox, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Purnell, Simon)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:21-cv-02320 and Member Case No. 4:21-cv-02321 by Giovanna Bulox, Matias Bulox, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/11/2021. (Purnell, Simon)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 10/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(DesireeSillasadi, 4)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to CooperSurgical, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(gclair, 4)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to CooperSurgical, Inc., filed.(Purnell, Simon)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to The Cooper Companies, Inc., filed.(Purnell, Simon)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to CooperSurgical, Inc., filed.(Purnell, Simon) (Docketed in Error per counsel by email) Modified on 7/19/2021 (MarcelleLaBee, 4).
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26759065) filed by Giovanna Bulox, Matias Bulox. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Purnell, Simon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bulox et al v. CooperSurgical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovanna Bulox
Represented By: Simon Brian Purnell
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matias Bulox
Represented By: Simon Brian Purnell
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Clark Edgecomb, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Clark Edgecomb, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lorena Ahiri Merlo
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Griffin
Represented By: Simon Brian Purnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Daniel Merlo
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Griffin
Represented By: Simon Brian Purnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?