United States of America v. Eidman
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Dan K Eidman
Case Number: 4:2021cv02345
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dan K Eidman, filed.(jdav, 4)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 Per filer, this document was filed in error. Corrected document docketed at entry 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dan K Eidman, filed.(gclair, 4) Modified on 9/16/2021 (jdav, 4).
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Dan K Eidman served on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021, filed.(Johns, Michelle)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/8/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(hlermaadi, 4)
July 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dan K Eidman. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Dan K Eidman, filed.(Johns, Michelle)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dan K Eidman filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johns, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Eidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michelle C Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan K Eidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?