Falick v. United Parcel Service Co.
Plaintiff: Michael Falick
Defendant: United Parcel Service Co.
Case Number: 4:2021cv02441
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 ***Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 Opposed MOTION to Remand : Responses due by 10/1/2021. (arrivera, 4)
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Michael Falick, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Falick, Michael)
August 15, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Michael Falick, filed.(Falick, Michael)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 First CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Parcel Service Co., filed.(Seiler, Kenna)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by United Parcel Service Co., filed.(Seiler, Kenna)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Justice Court Harris County, Texas, Precinct 1, Place 1, case number 211100172445 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26806693) filed by United Parcel Service Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seiler, Kenna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falick v. United Parcel Service Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Falick
Represented By: Michael Charles Falick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service Co.
Represented By: Kenna M Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?