Winchenbaugh et al v. Cabes, Jr.
Petitioner: Christopher F. Winchenbaugh and Hugh E. McGee, III
Respondent: Robert L. Cabes, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2021cv02459
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Stipulated PERMANENT INJUNCTION and ORDER OF DISMISSAL terminating #10 . Case terminated on 10/4/2021. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Christopher F. Winchenbaugh, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Temple, Mark)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on Temporary Restraint. Until 10/8/2021, no further action must be taken in Cabes's arbitration #8 . Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 10/6/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11C before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Hugh E. McGee, III, Christopher F. Winchenbaugh, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Temple, Mark)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 REPLY In Petition To Enjoin Arbitration, filed by Christopher F. Winchenbaugh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Declaration, #7 Exhibit Declaration, #8 Proposed Order)(Temple, Mark)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #1 Complaint , filed by Robert L. Cabes, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Downey, Mark)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Robert L. Cabes, Jr., filed.(Downey, Mark)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Robert L. Cabes, Jr.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(MelissaMorgan, 4)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Robert L. Cabes, Jr., filed.(Temple, Mark)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 10/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert L. Cabes, Jr. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26817887) filed by Christopher F. Winchenbaugh, Hugh E. McGee, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Temple, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winchenbaugh et al v. Cabes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher F. Winchenbaugh
Represented By: Mark D Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hugh E. McGee, III
Represented By: Mark D Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Cabes, Jr.
Represented By: Mark D Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?